The American Institute of Architects (AIA) inaugurated Dan Hart, FAIA, as its 98th president on Friday, Dec. 10.
“I’m spectacularly optimistic,” said Hart. “As I consider this moment in AIA’s deep history and the complexity that all of us together represent, I see beauty on the other side. I believe we are at a pivotal moment. As we move from aspiration to agency on our core dual strategies of addressing climate and justice through the built environment … we stand together and are prepared to take action.”
Hart has held a number of AIA leadership positions. He was the moderator of the AIA Strategic Council in 2016 and served on the AIA National Board of Directors. While on the board, he chaired the AIA Board Knowledge Committee and AIA Public Outreach Committee as well as co-chaired the AIA COVID-19 Business Task Force. He also served as president of the Texas Society of Architects in 2011.
After more than three decades as a practicing architect and engineer, Hart is a principal and executive vice president of architecture at Parkhill—a 450-person architecture and engineering firm headquartered in Texas—and serves on the firm’s board of directors. He has experience designing religious and educational buildings and has master-planned a variety of campuses.
Hart was also adjunct instructor for four years for senior-level architecture students at Texas Tech University, where he was the distinguished alumnus of the College of Architecture in 2017 and was the founding president of the college’s Design Leadership Alliance. Additionally, he was a trustee on the board of Schreiner University.
Hart earned a Bachelor of Architecture/Bachelor of Science, Civil Engineering from Texas Tech University. In 2014, he was elevated to AIA fellowship.
AIA elects its presidents on an annual basis. Hart will serve as the Institute’s president until Dec. 9, 2022. Complete details of AIA’s leadership are available online.
Related Stories
| Aug 3, 2012
Nonres construction spending to increase through 2012, growth projected for 2013
Commercial and industrial projects poised to lead building sectors.
| Jul 31, 2012
Thornton Tomasetti announces four promotions in Chicago office
Promotions in Thornton Tomasetti office key on industy veterans.
| Jul 25, 2012
EwingCole adds healthcare director to D.C. office
Schultz brings over 25 years of proven experience in planning and designing healthcare, medical research, and government medical facilities.
| Jul 25, 2012
Contract awarded for Gaillard Municipal Auditorium renovations in Charleston, S.C.
Seeking LEED Silver certification, the project will begin in August and is slated for completion in December 2014.
| Jul 24, 2012
Boyer joins Thornton Tomasetti as vice president in New York office
Boyer will support Thornton Tomasetti’s Building Performance and Property Loss Consulting practices in the East U.S. region as well as nationally.
| Jul 24, 2012
Dragon Valley Retail at epicenter of Yongsan International Business District
Masterplanned by architect Daniel Libeskind, the Yongsan IBD encompasses ten city blocks and includes a collection of high-rise residences and commercial buildings.
| Jul 23, 2012
Venturi Scott Brown and Associates Becomes VSBA, LLC
After over fifty years as one of the world’s most renowned architects, Bob Venturi has retired from practice, while Denise Scott Brown continues to publish and present her work.
| Jul 23, 2012
Giants 300 Firm Index 2012
An alphabetical index of the Giants 300 AEC firms and their ranking in specific categories.
| Jul 23, 2012
Haynes Whaley announces leadership transition
Pronier has worked in the construction industry for the past 30 years.
| Jul 23, 2012
Missner Group completes construction of Chicago auto dealership
The Missner Group also incorporated numerous sustainable improvements to the property including the implementation of a vegetative roof, and the utilization of permeable pavers for the parking lot.